House | 04/16/2025 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hall | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Oversight Committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Gillespie | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Maynard | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Government Oversight committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Referred to Elections and Ethics | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Government Oversight | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Coauthored by Representative Banning (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Thompson | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Senator Seifried |