House | 04/17/2025 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Reported Do Pass Technology and Telecommunications committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Technology and Telecommunications | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Senator Howard |