Oklahoma 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB646 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 24, 2025

Amended

Bill April 22, 2025
Bill March 5, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 4, 2025