House
|
04/17/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Haste
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Schreiber
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Policy recommendation to the Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Referred to Criminal Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Green
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Thompson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Alvord
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Senator Gollihare
|
|
|