Senate | 02/19/2025 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Senator Murdock | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | First Reading |