Oklahoma 2025 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB896 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/16/2025

                     
 
 
Req. No. 82 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 60th Legislature (2025) 
 
SENATE BILL 896 	By: Bergstrom 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to administrative rules; providing 
for termination of administrative rules by certain 
date; providing for renewal proc ess; preserving 
ability of the Legislature to repeal certain rules; 
establishing renewal request process; requiring 
publication of request; directing notification to 
certain agencies; providing for codification; 
providing an effective date ; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 328 of Title 75, unless there is 
created a duplication in numbe ring, reads as follows: 
A. 1. Any permanent rule promulgated or amended on or after 
the effective date of this act shall automatically terminate 
pursuant to the schedule prescribed in paragraph 2 of this 
subsection. 
2.  The Secretary of State shall devel op a schedule, subject to 
approval by the President Pro Tempore of the State S enate, the 
Speaker of the House of Representatives, and the Administrative 
Rules Committee chairs of both houses, for the initial expiration of   
 
 
Req. No. 82 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
the administrative rules of each s tate agency.  The schedule shall 
prescribe twenty percent (20%) of state agencies per calendar year 
whose rules shall expire. The schedule shall be devised as follows: 
a. the first twenty percent (20%) of agency rules shall 
initially expire on February 1, 2026, 
b. the second twenty percent (20%) of agency rules shall 
initially expire on February 1, 2027, 
c. the third twenty percent (20%) of agency rules shall 
initially expire on February 1, 2028, 
d. the fourth twenty percent (20%) of agency rules shall 
initially expire on February 1, 2029, and 
e. the fifth and final twenty percent (20%) of agency 
rules shall initially expire on February 1, 2030 . 
B.  A rule subject to termination under this section may be 
renewed for additional terms of five (5) years, or less, by the 
Legislature by approval and enactment of a joint resolution. 
C.  Nothing in this section shall preclude the ability of the 
Legislature to repeal a permanent rule prior to the automatic 
termination of the rule under this section. 
D.  An agency may request the renewal by the Legislature of a 
rule subject to automatic termination under this section. The 
request shall be submitted no less than one (1) year, and no more 
than two (2) years, prior to the date that the rule is set to 
terminate.  The agency shall demonstrate why renewal of the rule is   
 
 
Req. No. 82 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
necessary and shall include a cost-benefit analysis.  The agency 
shall also publish the request on its website. 
E. 1.  Except for rules expiring pursuant to subparagraph a of 
paragraph 2 of subsection A of this section, the Secretary of State 
shall provide notice to the promulgating agency at least eighteen 
(18) months prior to every rule ’s termination date. Agencies with 
rules expiring under subparagraph a of paragraph 2 of subsection A 
of this section shall be provided notice not later than sixty (60) 
days after the effective date of this act. 
2.  Lack of notice under this subsection shall not prevent 
expiration of any rules under an agency’s purview. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effec tive July 1, 2025. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and a fter its passage and approval. 
 
60-1-82 RD 1/16/2025 10:50:44 AM