Oklahoma 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB896 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB896 SFLR Page 1
4-(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
3+
4+Req. No. 82 Page 1 1
5+2
6+3
7+4
8+5
9+6
10+7
11+8
12+9
13+10
14+11
15+12
16+13
17+14
18+15
19+16
20+17
21+18
22+19
23+20
24+21
25+22
26+23
27+24
28+ 1
529 2
630 3
731 4
832 5
933 6
1034 7
1135 8
1236 9
1337 10
1438 11
1539 12
1640 13
1741 14
1842 15
1943 16
2044 17
2145 18
2246 19
2347 20
2448 21
2549 22
2650 23
2751 24
2852
29-SENATE FLOOR VERSION
30-February 13, 2025
31-AS AMENDED
53+STATE OF OKLAHOMA
3254
33-SENATE BILL NO. 896 By: Bergstrom
55+1st Session of the 60th Legislature (2025)
56+
57+SENATE BILL 896 By: Bergstrom
3458
3559
3660
3761
62+
63+AS INTRODUCED
3864
3965 An Act relating to administrative rules; providing
4066 for termination of administrative rules by certain
4167 date; providing for renewal proc ess; preserving
4268 ability of the Legislature to repeal certain rules;
4369 establishing renewal request process; requiring
4470 publication of request; directing notification to
4571 certain agencies; providing for codification;
4672 providing an effective date ; and declaring an
4773 emergency.
4874
4975
5076
51-
52-
5377 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:
5478 SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law to be codified
5579 in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 328 of Title 75, unless there is
5680 created a duplication in numbe ring, reads as follows:
57-A. 1. Any permanent rule promulgated or otherwise in effect on
58-or after the effective date of this act shall automatically
59-terminate pursuant to the schedule prescribed in paragraph 2 of this
81+A. 1. Any permanent rule promulgated or amended on or after
82+the effective date of this act shall automatically terminate
83+pursuant to the schedule prescribed in paragraph 2 of this
6084 subsection.
6185 2. The Secretary of State shall devel op a schedule, subject to
6286 approval by the President Pro Tempore of the State S enate, the
6387 Speaker of the House of Representatives, and the Administrative
6488 Rules Committee chairs of both houses, for the initial expiration of
6589
66-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB896 SFLR Page 2
67-(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
90+
91+Req. No. 82 Page 2 1
92+2
93+3
94+4
95+5
96+6
97+7
98+8
99+9
100+10
101+11
102+12
103+13
104+14
105+15
106+16
107+17
108+18
109+19
110+20
111+21
112+22
113+23
114+24
115+ 1
68116 2
69117 3
70118 4
71119 5
72120 6
73121 7
74122 8
75123 9
76124 10
77125 11
78126 12
79127 13
80128 14
81129 15
82130 16
83131 17
84132 18
85133 19
86134 20
87135 21
88136 22
89137 23
90138 24
91139
92140 the administrative rules of each s tate agency. The schedule shall
93141 prescribe twenty percent (20%) of state agencies per calendar year
94142 whose rules shall expire. The schedule shall be devised as follows:
95143 a. the first twenty percent (20%) of agency rules shall
96144 initially expire on February 1, 2026,
97145 b. the second twenty percent (20%) of agency rules shall
98146 initially expire on February 1, 2027,
99147 c. the third twenty percent (20%) of agency rules shall
100148 initially expire on February 1, 2028,
101149 d. the fourth twenty percent (20%) of agency rules shall
102150 initially expire on February 1, 2029, and
103151 e. the fifth and final twenty percent (20%) of agency
104152 rules shall initially expire on February 1, 2030 .
105153 B. A rule subject to termination under this section may be
106154 renewed for additional terms of five (5) years, or less, by the
107155 Legislature by approval and enactment of a joint resolution.
108156 C. Nothing in this section shall preclude the ability of the
109157 Legislature to repeal a permanent rule prior to the automatic
110158 termination of the rule under this section.
111159 D. An agency may request the renewal by the Legislature of a
112160 rule subject to automatic termination under this section. The
113161 request shall be submitted no less than one (1) year, and no more
114162 than two (2) years, prior to the date that the rule is set to
115163 terminate. The agency shall demonstrate why renewal of the rule is
116164
117-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB896 SFLR Page 3
118-(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1
165+
166+Req. No. 82 Page 3 1
167+2
168+3
169+4
170+5
171+6
172+7
173+8
174+9
175+10
176+11
177+12
178+13
179+14
180+15
181+16
182+17
183+18
184+19
185+20
186+21
187+22
188+23
189+24
190+ 1
119191 2
120192 3
121193 4
122194 5
123195 6
124196 7
125197 8
126198 9
127199 10
128200 11
129201 12
130202 13
131203 14
132204 15
133205 16
134206 17
135207 18
136208 19
137209 20
138210 21
139211 22
140212 23
141213 24
142214
143215 necessary and shall include a cost-benefit analysis. The agency
144216 shall also publish the request on its website.
145217 E. 1. Except for rules expiring pursuant to subparagraph a of
146218 paragraph 2 of subsection A of this section, the Secretary of State
147219 shall provide notice to the promulgating agency at least eighteen
148220 (18) months prior to every rule ’s termination date. Agencies with
149221 rules expiring under subparagraph a of paragraph 2 of subsection A
150222 of this section shall be provided notice not later than sixty (60)
151223 days after the effective date of this act.
152224 2. Lack of notice under this subsection shall not prevent
153225 expiration of any rules under an agency’s purview.
154226 SECTION 2. This act shall become effec tive July 1, 2025.
155227 SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservation
156228 of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby
157229 declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and
158230 be in full force from and a fter its passage and approval.
159-COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON ADMINISTRATIVE RULES
160-February 13, 2025 - DO PASS AS AMENDED
231+
232+60-1-82 RD 1/16/2025 10:50:44 AM