Senate | 02/25/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Coauthored by Representative Maynard (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | First Reading |