Senate | 03/03/2025 | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Senator Frix | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | First Reading |