Senate
|
05/14/2025
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Reinhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2025
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2025
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Pugh
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Maynard
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Hays
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Jenkins
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Shaw
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Banning
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Williams
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Gann
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Hardin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Eaves
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Rick)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Humphrey
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Hildebrant
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Woolley
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Alvord, Bergstrom, Bullard, Burns, Coleman, Frix, Gillespie, Green, Grellner, Guthrie, Hamilton, Haste, McIntosh, Murdock, Pederson, Prieto, Pugh, Rader, Reinhardt, Sacchieri, Seifried, Standridge, Stanley, Stewart, Weaver, Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Olsen (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Authored by Senator Deevers
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|