Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Effective date, June 6, 2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Chapter 91, 2024 Laws.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Governor signed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Third reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 22--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Conrad, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Smith G, Stout, Wallan, Wright, Yunker; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Owens.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Recommendation: Do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Third reading. Carried by President Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 11--Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hayden, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Work Session held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Returned to Full Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2024
|
Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Public Hearing held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|