Senate | 03/07/2024 | In committee upon adjournment. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Referred to Veterans, Emergency Management, Federal and World Affairs, then Ways and Means. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |