Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Effective date, March 27, 2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Chapter 51, 2024 Laws.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Governor signed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Andersen. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 4--Cate, Reschke, Wallan, Yunker; Absent, 1--Conrad; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Javadi; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Boice, Bynum, Ruiz.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Recommendation: Do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Work Session held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Public Hearing held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Robinson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Referred to Energy and Environment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|