Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Effective date, April 17, 2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Chapter 108, 2024 Laws.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Governor signed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 14--Cate, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Hieb, Levy B, Lewis, McIntire, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wallan, Yunker; Absent, 1--Sanchez; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Javadi; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Boice, Bynum.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Recommendation: Do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Hansell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Work Session held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Returned to Full Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2024
|
Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Public Hearing and Work Session held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Referred to Housing and Development, then Ways and Means.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|