Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Effective date, March 27, 2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Chapter 54, 2024 Laws.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Governor signed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
President signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Bonham, Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 2--Thatcher, Weber.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Cate, Scharf; Excused, 3--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Owens.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Work Session held.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gomberg.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Recommendation: Do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Referred to Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Robinson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 4--Bonham, Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Carried over to 02-28 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Returned to Full Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2024
|
Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Public Hearing held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Referred to Veterans, Emergency Management, Federal and World Affairs, then Ways and Means.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|