House
|
03/07/2024
|
In committee upon adjournment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Third reading. Carried by Thatcher, Steiner. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 14--Bonham, Campos, Findley, Gelser Blouin, Girod, Hayden, Jama, Knopp, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, Smith DB, Taylor, Woods.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Carried over to 03-04 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Work Session held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Public Hearing held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Motion to refer to Committee on Rules carried. Ayes, 28; Nays, 2--Campos, Taylor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Motion to reconsider carried. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Campos, Taylor, Woods; Excused, 1--Girod.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Thatcher, changed from aye to nay and served notice of possible reconsideration.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Bill failed. Ayes, 14; Nays, 16--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Gorsek, Hansell, Hayden, Jama, Knopp, Lieber, Manning Jr, Prozanski, Taylor, Thatcher, Woods.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Recommendation: Do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Informational Meeting held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Referred to Veterans, Emergency Management, Federal and World Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|