Senate | 05/05/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Referred to Education. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Third reading. Carried by McIntire. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 14--Boice, Boshart Davis, Diehl, Drazan, Edwards, Elmer, Harbick, Helfrich, Lewis, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Skarlatos, Yunker; Excused, 3--Cate, Nguyen H, Walters; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Breese-Iverson, Helm, Sanchez, Wallan. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |