Senate | 04/22/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Referred to Early Childhood and Behavioral Health. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Nelson. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused, 7--Evans, Levy E, Nguyen H, Owens, Smith G, Valderrama, Wright. | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |