Senate | 04/30/2025 | Carried over to 05-01 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Carried over to 04-30 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Referred to Judiciary. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Tran. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Cate, Evans, Javadi, McIntire, Nguyen H, Wright. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |