Senate | 04/30/2025 | Carried over to 05-01 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Osborne. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Lively, Nguyen H, Wallan. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 4, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |