Senate | 04/17/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Referred to Early Childhood and Behavioral Health. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Third reading. Carried by McIntire. Passed. Ayes, 50; Excused, 6--Evans, Grayber, McDonald, Nguyen H, Scharf, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Diehl, Drazan, Osborne, Yunker. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Work Session cancelled. | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |