Senate | 04/29/2025 | Carried over to 04-30 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Carried over to 04-29 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Rules. | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Pham H. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--McDonald, Nguyen H. | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |