Senate | 05/07/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Referred to Judiciary. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Tran. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 3--Cate, Nguyen H, Valderrama; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Chotzen, Evans, Kropf, Osborne, Wallan. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |