Senate | 04/30/2025 | Carried over to 05-01 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Carried over to 04-30 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Referred to Judiciary. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Yunker; Excused, 2--Nguyen H, Tran. | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Carried over to February 18, 2025 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 13, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |