Senate | 04/29/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Pham. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Frederick. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Carried over to 04-29 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Carried over to 04-28 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Referred to Labor and Business. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Fragala. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Nguyen H, Tran. | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Carried over to February 18, 2025 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Labor and Workplace Standards. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |