House | 02/19/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Work Session cancelled. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |