Senate | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Housing and Development. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Breese-Iverson. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Cate, Evans, Helfrich, Nguyen H; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McLain. | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 3, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Carried over to April 2, 2025 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Housing and Homelessness. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |