Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 3--Anderson, Meek, Thatcher.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Carried over to 05-01 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Work Session scheduled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Public Hearing Scheduled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Referred to Early Childhood and Behavioral Health.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
First reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused, 6--Evans, Grayber, McDonald, Nguyen H, Scharf, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Boice, Diehl, Drazan, Elmer, Osborne, Reschke, Yunker.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Work Session held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2025
|
Work Session cancelled.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Public Hearing held.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2025
|
Referred to Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2025
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|