Senate | 04/30/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Referred to Education. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Dobson. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 4--Cate, Lewis, Nguyen H, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Drazan, Wallan, Speaker Fahey. | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 9, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |