Senate | 05/06/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Referred to Human Services. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Cate, Evans, Nguyen H, Walters; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Fahey. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |