House | 04/30/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Referred to Addiction and Community Safety Response by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Addiction and Community Safety Response, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 01/24/2025 | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |