Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Third reading. Carried by Smith DB, Meek. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 2--Frederick, Starr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Carried over to 04-30 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Carried over to 04-29 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Work Session scheduled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Work Session held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Public Hearing held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Public Hearing Scheduled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Referred to Veterans, Emergency Management, Federal and World Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
First reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Third reading. Carried by Skarlatos. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 4--Cate, Lewis, Nguyen H, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Speaker Fahey.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2025 Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Rules suspended. Carried over to April 9, 2025 Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans by order of Speaker.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
Referred to Rules.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|