Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Carried over to 04-28 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Carried over to 04-23 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Carried over to 04-22 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Carried over to 04-21 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Carried over to 04-16 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Carried over to 04-15 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Recommendation: Do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Work Session scheduled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Public Hearing Scheduled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Referred to Rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
First reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Third reading. Carried by Pham H. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 6--Boice, Diehl, Evans, Lewis, Reschke, Yunker; Excused, 3--Helm, Nguyen H, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McIntire.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Rules suspended. Carried over to March 6, 2025 Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2025
|
Work Session held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Public Hearing held.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|