Senate | 05/01/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 3--Anderson, Meek, Thatcher. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Labor and Business. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Third reading. Carried by McIntire. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused, 2--McDonald, Nguyen H. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |