Senate | 04/30/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Referred to Education. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 5--Cate, Evans, Helm, Nguyen H, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Javadi, McIntire. | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 9, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |