House | 04/11/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |