LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oregon OR
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB3478
Action History
OR
Oregon House Bill HB3478
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3478
Action History
House
05/01/2025
Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
House
04/21/2025
Work Session scheduled.
House
04/08/2025
Public Hearing scheduled.
House
02/06/2025
Referred to Transportation.
House
02/04/2025
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.