Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Housing and Development by order of the President. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Housing and Development. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Referred to Education. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Hartman. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 18--Boice, Boshart Davis, Cate, Diehl, Drazan, Edwards, Elmer, Harbick, Helfrich, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, Osborne, Owens, Scharf, Skarlatos, Wallan, Yunker; Excused, 5--Breese-Iverson, Dobson, McDonald, Nguyen H, Valderrama; Excused for Business of the House, 4--McIntire, Reschke, Smith G, Wright. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Referred to Housing and Homelessness. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |