House | 04/01/2025 | Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference. | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |