Senate | 05/06/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Referred to Labor and Business. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 15--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Edwards, Harbick, Helfrich, Levy B, Lewis, McIntire, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Wright, Yunker; Excused, 9--Cate, Elmer, Evans, Javadi, McDonald, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Skarlatos, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Owens. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Referred to Labor and Workplace Standards. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |