House | 04/16/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |