Senate | 05/08/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Referred to Judiciary. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Harbick. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused, 6--Dobson, Helm, McDonald, Nguyen H, Sosa, Valderrama; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Boshart Davis, Levy E, Sanchez, Smith G, Wright. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |