Senate | 05/06/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Referred to Judiciary. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Chotzen. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 4--Boice, Elmer, Harbick, Skarlatos; Excused, 4--Cate, Evans, Nguyen H, Osborne; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Helm. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 7, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 3, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |