Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Public Hearing Scheduled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Referred to Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
First reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Third reading. Carried by Owens. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 8--Boice, Diehl, Drazan, Elmer, Evans, Lewis, Skarlatos, Yunker; Excused, 6--Dobson, Helm, McDonald, Nguyen H, Sosa, Valderrama; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Boshart Davis, Levy E, Sanchez, Smith G, Wright.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2025 Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2025 Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2025
|
Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Work Session scheduled.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|