Senate | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Labor and Business. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Tran. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 27--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Diehl, Drazan, Edwards, Elmer, Gomberg, Helfrich, Isadore, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Nguyen D, Osborne, Owens, Pham H, Reschke, Scharf, Skarlatos, Smith G, Wallan, Wright, Yunker; Excused, 1--Nguyen H; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Harbick. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 21, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |