Senate | 04/28/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Referred to Energy and Environment. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Levy E, Levy B. Passed. Ayes, 51; Excused, 8--Dobson, Grayber, Helfrich, McDonald, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Sosa, Valderrama; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Sanchez. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |