Senate | 04/29/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Referred to Human Services. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Ruiz. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 11--Boice, Boshart Davis, Diehl, Elmer, Harbick, Lewis, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Skarlatos, Yunker; Excused, 4--Cate, Evans, Nguyen H, Walters; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Drazan. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 14, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |