LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oregon OR
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB3800
Action History
OR
Oregon House Bill HB3800
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oregon 2025 Regular Session
Oregon House Bill HB3800
Action History
House
04/10/2025
Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
House
04/10/2025
Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
House
04/07/2025
Work Session scheduled.
House
03/26/2025
Public Hearing scheduled.
House
03/04/2025
Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water.
House
02/27/2025
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.