Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Third reading. Carried by Weber, Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 3--Anderson, Meek, Thatcher.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Possible Work Session scheduled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Public Hearing held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Public Hearing Scheduled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
First reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 51; Excused, 9--Cate, Evans, Helm, McIntire, Nguyen H, Owens, Reschke, Wallan, Walters.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2025 Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Rules suspended. Carried over to April 9, 2025 Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2025
|
Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Work Session scheduled.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|