House | 04/29/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment with subsequent referral to Revenue. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |